U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10344
  • Case Name: AM Project 169 NWS LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Objection]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Employ]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.