U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41130
  • Case Name: Vichet Sinuon and Melissa Sinuon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amend]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Change of Address (Proof of Claim)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.