U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10464
  • Case Name: Steven E. Pearson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Vacate]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Update]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.