U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-30156
  • Case Name: Alexander Tollis and Annalisa Dagostino-Tollis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdrawal of Document]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.