U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Viliena
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 28, 2025: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 26, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • March 16, 2025: [Sequester]
  • March 16, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 14, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Clarification]
  • March 13, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 11, 2025: [Trial Brief ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.