U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-30014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Masaschi, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 27, 2025: [Proposed Order submitted]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.