U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rath et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.