U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 30, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - Appeal]
  • March 12, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 12, 2025: [Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.