U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-30023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heredia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.