U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stephen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appendix/Exhibit]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.