U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Navichoque-Barrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.