U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40247
  • Case Name: Jordan Barry Fishman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Tax Documents]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Vacate Discharge]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Vacate Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.