U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01003
  • Case Name: Cameron v. Cameron
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response]
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.