U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41202
  • Case Name: Kyra Isabel Nelson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [** Not Used ** Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Issues]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Appellant Designation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order from BAP re: Appeal]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Initial Transmittal to (BAP)/District Court]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice to District Court]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice to BAP]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion To Reconsider]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Reconsider]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [** Not Used ** Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Amend]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Exemptions]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amend]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdraw Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [** Not Used ** Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.