U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10472
  • Case Name: SaaliRealty LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Vote]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.