U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 16, 2025: [Excludable Delay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Manual Filing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.