U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10202-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Groves et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Seal]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 25, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 25, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 25, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum - not related to a motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.