U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40240
  • Case Name: John A. Aliperta
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Amend]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amend]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.