U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30125
  • Case Name: Sally Rourke
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Show Cause(Response)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Affidavit]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.