U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12544
  • Case Name: John E Carpenter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Reply]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Financial Management Course]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.