U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10187
  • Case Name: Daniel Joshua Noe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)(Auto)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion for Adequate Protection]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.