U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-mj-04573-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandoval-Perez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 17, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.