U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10428
  • Case Name: Yocix Guzman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Extend Time]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Signature Page]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.