U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12598
  • Case Name: Fahredin Flamurtari
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Withdrawal of Document]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.