U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40133
  • Case Name: Rebecca J. Sena
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.