U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40230
  • Case Name: Valerie D. Bernier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amend]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Show Cause(Response)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amend]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.