U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12456
  • Case Name: Jan Hendrik Steenbrugge
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Objection]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Objection]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion To Limit/Shorten Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [2004 Examination]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Employ]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Application to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.