U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12123
  • Case Name: Michael Kelly
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Vacate Discharge]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.