U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30078
  • Case Name: Donna Kelley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Application to Employ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Amend]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Asset Notice Report]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Employ]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Intent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.