U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10349
  • Case Name: Rolanda Devon Herbert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Schedules (Original)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.