U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10355-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendez Herrera, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Canceling Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.