U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lara et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Transcript at Government Expense]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcripts at government expense]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.