U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40023
  • Case Name: Theresa Ann Cherry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Exhibit]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Objection]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Withdraw Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Convert Case to 13]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Assent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.