U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-04006
  • Case Name: Castro Pagan v. HSBC Bank USA National Association on behalf of th
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order To Set Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Agreement for Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Order]
  • April 08, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 18, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 18, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 14, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.