U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30133
  • Case Name: Barbara J. Williams and Ronnie L. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.