U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12096
  • Case Name: Hawthorne Food Company
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Response]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Compensation]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Abandonment]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Compromise]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Compensation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.