U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41206
  • Case Name: Toby Sanethong
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amend]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Affidavit of Non-Compliance]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdraw Document]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.