U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10395
  • Case Name: Laura B. Balestraci
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.