U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-01037
  • Case Name: Armanetti v. Cassidy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order To Set Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.