U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12569
  • Case Name: Online Learning Consortium, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Pay]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Assume/Reject]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Affidavit]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Vote]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Objection]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Compensation]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Compensation]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Pay]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Assume/Reject]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amended Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [For Order/Authority]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.