U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41330
  • Case Name: Bradley Krasphou
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Post/No-Post Petition Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order to Update]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Convert Case to 7]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.