U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41303
  • Case Name: Elita 7, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion To Set Bar Date]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amend]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Bar Date]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.