U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10217
  • Case Name: SBF Ventures, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Employ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Application to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.