U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Botello
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.