U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrada Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.