U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-11099
  • Case Name: Patricia A Morris
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Opposition]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Approve]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.