U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10065-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Melendez Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.