U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10367-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.