U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10377-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tavares
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 28, 2025: [Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.