U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30002
  • Case Name: Pamela Marie Sergienko
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.